|
08/13/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 132, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5994.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4203.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4823.)
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|