05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/19/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/18/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/17/2010 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10). | |||
05/10/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
05/04/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3). | |||
04/12/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/18/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Read first time. To print. |