|
08/13/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 133, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4098.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4983.)
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|