|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 67. Noes 6. Page 6777.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6644.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4842.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 1. Page 5286.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|