06/10/2010 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/01/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/01/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 5406.) | |||
05/28/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/28/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/21/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/20/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/19/2010 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 7). | |||
03/22/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/18/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Read first time. To print. |