California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2019 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/20/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2019AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Torlakson  (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Blakeslee,   Huffman,   and Saldana   )  FEBRUARY 17, 2010 An act to add Article 15.1 (commencing with Section 51875) to Chapter 5 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to education technology. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2019, as amended, Torlakson. Education: education technology. Existing law establishes various programs to enhance education technology, including the California Technology Assistance Project, which is composed of regional consortia that work collaboratively with school districts and county offices of education to meet locally defined educational needs that can be effectively addressed with the use of technology, as specified. This bill would authorize the Superintendent of Public Instruction to establish a task force for education technology, funded by private donations, for the purpose of making recommendations to increase and enhance the level of technology used to deliver instruction in California public schools. The task force would consist of no more than 15 education technology experts, including, but not necessarily limited to, parents, current credentialed teachers, administrators, school board members, researchers, and industry representatives, as specified. This bill would require the task force to address specified topics to be presented to the state board  and the Legislature  on or before September 1, 2012, and require the state board to adopt a comprehensive statewide plan to increase and enhance the level of technology used to deliver instruction in California public schools technology literacy model content standards, pursuant to the recommendations of the task force, on or before January 1, 2013.  The bill would provide that the report to the Legislature be in a specified form. This provision   would be inoperative on September 1, 2016.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Article 15.1 (commencing with Section 51875) is added to Chapter 5 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, to read: Article 15.1. Education Technology Task Force 51875. (a) The Superintendent has authority to convene a task force for education technology. The task force shall develop recommendations for a comprehensive statewide plan to increase and enhance the level of technology used to deliver instruction in California public schools. The operations of the task force shall be funded by private donations. (b) The membership of the task force shall consist of no more than 15 education technology experts, including, but not necessarily limited to, parents, current credentialed teachers, administrators, school board members, researchers, and industry representatives. Current credentialed teachers shall comprise a majority of the task force. The task force shall include at least one member from a large school district, at least one member from a medium-sized school district, and at least one member from a small school district. The members representing these various sizes of school districts may be any combination of parents, teachers, administrators, or school board members. 51875.1. The task force shall address all of the following as part of its recommendations, to be presented to the state board  and the Legislature  on or before September 1, 2012, for a comprehensive statewide plan to increase and enhance the level of technology used to deliver instruction in California public schools  , and to the extent feasible, shall consider previously developed state technology plans, including, but not limited to, a plan developed pursuant to the No Child Left Behind Act of 2001 (20 U.S.C. Sec. 6301 et seq.) and Chapter 830 of the Statutes of 1999  : (a) Professional development based on a study of existing industry models for professional development in technology and existing school professional development programs. The task force shall provide recommendations for the improvement of school technology in professional development. (b) Electronic learning resources and instructional materials, based on a study of trends in long-term compatibility of resources and hardware and best practices in the use of electronic resources. The task force also shall develop plans for long-term compatibility of resources and hardware. (c) Hardware, with an emphasis on long-term compatibility between hardware and software systems and intersystem compatibility. The task force also shall address extended life cycle plans to preclude the premature obsolescence of equipment. (d) Telecommunications infrastructure, based on a study of industry standards for wireless interoperability. The task force also shall recommend adoption of a standard for telecommunications infrastructure for schools. (e) Funding, based on an assessment of various funding models. The task force also shall make recommendations on methods of providing reasonable levels of funding for technology in schools on a continuing basis.  (f) (1) The requirement for submitting a report imposed under this section is inoperative on September 1, 2016, pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code.   (2) A report to be submitted pursuant to this section shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.  51875.2. The state board shall adopt a comprehensive statewide plan to increase and enhance the level of technology used to deliver instruction in California public schools, pursuant to the recommendations of the task force, on or before January 1, 2013. 51875.3. The department is authorized to accept private donations to support the expenses incurred in operating the task force pursuant to this article.