|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 588, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6261.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4452.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading. (Corrected August 5.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4686.)
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|