|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 589, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4704.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5242.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. (Corrected May 13.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|