|
06/15/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 3. Page 4938.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 24).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|