06/17/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/09/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/18/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/29/2010 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/08/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/08/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4546.) | |||
03/25/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
03/24/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 23). | |||
02/18/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Read first time. To print. |