|
09/28/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6392.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4596.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 26. Page 5081.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|