|
05/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 13). From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|