California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2039 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/04/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2039ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE JULY 1, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 2, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 22, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Logue FEBRUARY 17, 2010 An act to amend Sections 18986.60 and 18986.61 of, and to repeal Section 18986.62 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2039, Logue. Placer County integrated health and human services program. Existing law requires Placer County, upon approval of the county, and with the assistance of the appropriate state departments, to implement a pilot program, for the funding and delivery of services and benefits through an integrated and comprehensive county health and human services system. Under existing law, these provisions become inoperative on July 1, 2011, and are repealed on January 1, 2012. This bill would delete references identifying the program as a pilot project, and would delete the dates upon which the program becomes inoperative and is repealed, thus extending its operation indefinitely. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 18986.60 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is amended to read: 18986.60. (a) Placer County, with the assistance of the appropriate state departments, within the existing resources of those departments, shall implement a program upon approval of that county, for the funding and delivery of services and benefits through an integrated and comprehensive county health and human services system. (b) The Placer County project shall, in providing services through an integrated system to families and individuals, among other things, do all of the following: (1) Implement and evaluate a system of universal intake for those seeking services. (2) Implement and evaluate a system whereby a family or individual eligible for more than one service may be provided those services by as few as a single county employee, through an integrated, coordinated service plan. (3) Implement and evaluate a system of administration that centralizes the management and support of client services. (4) Implement and evaluate a system of reporting and accountability that provides for the combined provision of services as provided for in paragraph (2), without the loss of state or federal funds provided under current law. (c) The integrated system may include, but need not be limited to, any or all of the following: (1) Adoption services. (2) Child abuse prevention services. (3) Child welfare services. (4) Delinquency prevention services. (5) Drug and alcohol services. (6) Mental health services. (7) Eligibility determination. (8) Employment and training services. (9) Foster care services. (10) Health services. (11) Public health services. (12) Housing services. (13) Medically indigent program services. (14) All other appropriately identified and targeted services, except for dental care. (d) Programs or services shall be included in the project only to the extent that federal funding to either the state or the county will not be reduced as a result of the inclusion of the services in the project. This project shall not generate any increased expenditures from the General Fund. (e) The county and the appropriate state departments shall jointly seek federal approval of the project, as may be needed to ensure its funding and allow for the integrated provision of services. (f) This chapter shall not authorize Placer County to discontinue meeting its obligations under current law to provide services or to reduce its accountability for the provision of these services. (g) This chapter shall not authorize Placer County to reduce Placer County's eligibility under current law for state funding for the services included in the project. (h) Placer County shall utilize any and all state general and county funds that it is legally allocated or entitled to receive. Through the creation of integrated health and social services structures, the county shall maximize federal matching funds. (i) The appropriate state departments that are assisting and cooperating in the implementation of the project authorized by this chapter shall have the authority to waive regulations regarding the method of providing services and the method of reporting and accountability, as may be required to meet the goals set forth in subdivision (b). SEC. 2. Section 18986.61 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is amended to read: 18986.61. (a) Placer County shall evaluate the program and shall prepare a final evaluation and submit the final evaluation to the Governor or the Governor's designee and the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature not later than six months following the third year of the implementation of the program. (b) The county, with the assistance of the appropriate state departments, shall seek private funding to provide for the evaluation of the program. The evaluation required by this section shall be conducted only if nonstate resources are made available for this purpose. SEC. 3. Section 18986.62 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is repealed.