|
05/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D., L. GOV. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|