|
06/03/2010
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 45. Noes 26. Page 5574.) Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 35. Noes 33. Page 5590.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 38. Noes 31. Page 5529.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Arambula.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|