06/22/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/27/2010 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/13/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 5143.) | |||
05/10/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 5). | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |||
03/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |||
02/19/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |