LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2059
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2059
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2059
Compare Versions
AB2059 Amended August 20, 2010
AB2059 Amended June 29, 2010
AB2059 Amended June 14, 2010
AB2059 Amended May 10, 2010
AB2059 Amended April 22, 2010
AB2059 Amended March 25, 2010
AB2059 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2059 Amended August 20, 2010
AB2059 Amended June 29, 2010
AB2059 Amended June 14, 2010
AB2059 Amended May 10, 2010
AB2059 Amended April 22, 2010
AB2059 Amended March 25, 2010
AB2059 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare