|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6707.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6751.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 0. Page 4859.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 1). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5406.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|