05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/19/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 5). | |||
05/04/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
05/03/2010 | Read second time and amended. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4972.) | |||
04/29/2010 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |||
04/12/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/19/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |