04/21/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation. | |||
04/15/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |||
04/14/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/13/2010 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 13). | |||
04/08/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/07/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/22/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on INS. | |||
03/18/2010 | Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |