|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6779.) (Corrected September 9.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6644.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4824.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to JR 61(b)(14).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 5. Page 5150.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|