|
08/30/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Wolk.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 1).
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 5049.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|