LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2079
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2079
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2079
Compare Versions
AB2079 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB2079 Enrolled September 3, 2010
AB2079 Amended August 20, 2010
AB2079 Amended August 17, 2010
AB2079 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2079 Amended May 28, 2010
AB2079 Amended April 12, 2010
AB2079 Amended March 25, 2010
AB2079 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2079 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB2079 Enrolled September 3, 2010
AB2079 Amended August 20, 2010
AB2079 Amended August 17, 2010
AB2079 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2079 Amended May 28, 2010
AB2079 Amended April 12, 2010
AB2079 Amended March 25, 2010
AB2079 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare