LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2096
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2096
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2096
Action History
04/20/2010
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/13/2010
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
04/05/2010
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
03/11/2010
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
02/19/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
02/18/2010
Read first time. To print.