|
08/27/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6799.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6732.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6691.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69 (d) suspended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Corrected August 24.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. (Corrected June 24.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|