|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 89, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 1761.)
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 1346.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|