06/17/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/14/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/03/2010 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
05/20/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/20/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5252.) | |||
05/05/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/04/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |||
04/20/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/19/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |