|
08/30/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Romero.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 5517.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 19).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|