|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 20. Page 4978.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|