California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2116 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2010

Chaptered

Bill August 27, 2010

Amended

Bill June 29, 2010
Bill April 5, 2010