06/29/2010 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
06/22/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/29/2010 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/12/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/12/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4598.) | |||
04/07/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
04/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 5). | |||
03/15/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/19/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |