California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2120 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2010

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2010

Chaptered

Bill July 15, 2010

Amended

Bill June 22, 2010
Bill May 20, 2010
Bill April 29, 2010
Bill March 22, 2010