California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2129 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 2, 2010