|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2741.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1927.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 755.)
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|