|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6558.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6580.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4790.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5549.) Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 5552.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5447.).
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|