California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2134 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 4, 2010

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2010

Amended

Bill April 19, 2010
Bill March 25, 2010