California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2136 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill August 20, 2010
Bill August 17, 2010
Bill July 15, 2010
Bill June 16, 2010
Bill May 13, 2010
Bill May 6, 2010
Bill April 27, 2010