02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/28/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/06/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/27/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/23/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/22/2009 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 14). | |||
03/04/2009 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
02/04/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. | |||
02/03/2009 | Read first time. To print. |