California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2144 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2010

Chaptered

Bill August 30, 2010

Amended

Bill August 3, 2010
Bill June 10, 2010
Bill April 14, 2010