California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2145 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill June 29, 2010
Bill May 28, 2010