05/20/2010 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/10/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/10/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 5085.) | |||
05/06/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/05/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 5). | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |||
02/19/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |