|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 420, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 68. Noes 9. Page 3165.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2205.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 1542.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|