|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6789.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4833.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading. (Corrected August 31.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time and passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 4686.) Reconsideration of favorable vote granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4686.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 30). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5235.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 12).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS. by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|