04/21/2010 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/20/2010 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. | |||
04/15/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/06/2010 | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
03/23/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/19/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |