08/30/2010 | To inactive file on motion of Senator Strickland. | |||
06/30/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/29/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 28). | |||
06/17/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 16). | |||
05/06/2010 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/26/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/26/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 4855.) | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) (April 13). | |||
02/19/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |