|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4938.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 19. Page 4550.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|