|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 91, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4200.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5393.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|