|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 376, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 4575.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 7. Page 5258.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 12).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. (Corrected April 7.)
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|