06/29/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation. | |||
06/03/2010 | Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |||
05/20/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/20/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 2. Page 5240.) | |||
05/06/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/05/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |||
04/29/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
04/28/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/05/2010 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/19/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read first time. To print. |