|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 546, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 6386.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 4601.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 5189.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|